|
09/25/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 531, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2022
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2022
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 31).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2022
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2022
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2022
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2022
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/20/2022
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2022
|
Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 0. Page 4581.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/30/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E. & R. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2022
|
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2022
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2022
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|