Assembly | 05/03/2022 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 04/21/2022 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 04/19/2022 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 04/06/2022 | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | ||
Assembly | 04/05/2022 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/03/2022 | Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and JUD. | ||
Assembly | 02/18/2022 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2022 | Read first time. To print. |