Senate | 08/11/2022 | In Senate. Held at Desk. | ||
Assembly | 08/11/2022 | Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 08/11/2022 | Withdrawn from Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 08/08/2022 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/08/2022 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4682.). | ||
Senate | 08/02/2022 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 08/01/2022 | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/29/2022 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 06/01/2022 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Senate | 05/26/2022 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/25/2022 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5035.) | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2022 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 18). | ||
Assembly | 05/11/2022 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 04/20/2022 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 02/18/2022 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2022 | Read first time. To print. |