|
09/30/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 967, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2022
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2022
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 60. Noes 16.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2022
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4941.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 21).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2022
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 13).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2022
|
Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 0. Page 4694.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 5).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/24/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/24/2022
|
Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2022
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2022
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|