California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2473 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2022

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2022

Amended

Bill August 18, 2022
Bill August 16, 2022
Bill August 1, 2022
Bill April 21, 2022
Bill March 30, 2022