Assembly | 05/19/2022 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 05/19/2022 | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4736.) | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2022 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/27/2022 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/29/2022 | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. | ||
Assembly | 03/28/2022 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/24/2022 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 23). | ||
Assembly | 03/10/2022 | Referred to Coms. on ED. and HUM. S. | ||
Assembly | 02/18/2022 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2022 | Read first time. To print. |