California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2480 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2022

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 25, 2022

Amended

Bill June 14, 2022
Bill April 20, 2022