|
09/30/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 933, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2022
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 65. Noes 5.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2022
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 60. Noes 16.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2022
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 8. Page 4951.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2022
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2022
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 22).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2022
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 4. Page 4574.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2022
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4468.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (April 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/29/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/10/2022
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2022
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2022
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|