California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2484 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2022

Amended

Bill June 30, 2022
Bill June 20, 2022
Bill May 25, 2022
Bill May 19, 2022
Bill May 3, 2022
Bill April 18, 2022