|
09/18/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 411, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/18/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2022
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 10. Page 5230.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2022
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2022
|
Referred to Coms. on E. & C.A. and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 20. Page 4853.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2022
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on ELECTIONS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/24/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ELECTIONS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/24/2022
|
Referred to Coms. on ELECTIONS and L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2022
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2022
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|