Assembly | 02/01/2022 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2022 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 01/11/2022 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 03/22/2021 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 01/28/2021 | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | ||
Assembly | 01/15/2021 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 14. | ||
Assembly | 01/14/2021 | Read first time. To print. |