California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2501 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2022

Amended

Bill May 23, 2022
Bill May 19, 2022
Bill April 19, 2022
Bill March 24, 2022