Senate
|
08/11/2022
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2022
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2022
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2022
|
Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4854.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2022
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2022
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2022
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/24/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/24/2022
|
Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2022
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2022
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|