LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2021-2022 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2506
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2506
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2021-2022 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2506
Action History
Assembly
04/26/2022
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Assembly
03/24/2022
Re-referred to Coms. on B. & P. and REV. & TAX. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
Assembly
03/10/2022
Referred to Coms. on REV. & TAX. and B. & P.
Assembly
02/18/2022
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
Assembly
02/17/2022
Read first time. To print.