Assembly | 05/19/2022 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 05/11/2022 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/21/2022 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/20/2022 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/19/2022 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (April 19). | ||
Assembly | 04/05/2022 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 10. Noes 2.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 03/30/2022 | Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. | ||
Assembly | 03/29/2022 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P., & W. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/10/2022 | Referred to Coms. on W.,P., & W. and JUD. | ||
Assembly | 02/18/2022 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2022 | Read first time. To print. |