California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2517 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2022

Enrolled

Bill September 1, 2022

Amended

Bill August 25, 2022
Bill August 11, 2022
Bill June 22, 2022
Bill June 13, 2022
Bill April 19, 2022