California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2520 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2022

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2022

Amended

Bill August 11, 2022
Bill April 21, 2022
Bill April 7, 2022
Bill March 24, 2022