Senate
|
08/11/2022
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2022
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2022
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2022
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 22).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2022
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4832.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2022
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4736.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2022
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2022
|
(pending re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2022
|
Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 4359.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2022
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2022
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2022
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2022
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|