Senate | 06/28/2022 | In committee: Set, final hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 06/22/2021 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 06/15/2021 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 05/12/2021 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 04/15/2021 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 04/15/2021 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 11. Page 1029.) | ||
Assembly | 03/25/2021 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 03/24/2021 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (March 23). | ||
Assembly | 01/15/2021 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 14. | ||
Assembly | 01/14/2021 | Read first time. To print. |