California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2530 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2022

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2022

Amended

Bill August 18, 2022
Bill August 1, 2022
Bill June 20, 2022