Senate
|
08/11/2022
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2022
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2021
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1752.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2021
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2021
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/15/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 14.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/14/2021
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|