Assembly | 04/26/2022 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 03/29/2022 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2022 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 03/17/2022 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/10/2022 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 02/18/2022 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2022 | Read first time. To print. |