California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2559 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2022

Enrolled

Bill August 25, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 13, 2022

Amended

Bill June 23, 2022
Bill May 4, 2022
Bill April 26, 2022
Bill March 24, 2022