|
09/18/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 393, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/18/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2022
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5120.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 22).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on INS. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 6). Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2022
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and INS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 4521.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/30/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 30). Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/10/2022
|
Referred to Coms. on INS. and B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2022
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2022
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|