Senate | 08/11/2022 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Senate | 08/02/2022 | In committee: Referred to suspense file. | ||
Senate | 06/14/2022 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 06/01/2022 | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. | ||
Senate | 05/24/2022 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2022 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4857.) | ||
Assembly | 05/19/2022 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/19/2022 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 19). | ||
Assembly | 05/11/2022 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/27/2022 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/10/2022 | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2022 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. | ||
Assembly | 02/18/2022 | Introduced. To print. |