Assembly
|
02/01/2022
|
From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/31/2022
|
Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/20/2022
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2021
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2021
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2021
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/22/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/28/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/16/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 15.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/15/2021
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|