|
09/29/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 792, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2022
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2022
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5368.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2022
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2022
|
Measure version as amended on August 25 corrected.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2022
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2022
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2022
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2022
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2022
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4998.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2022
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2022
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 22. Noes 0.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2022
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2022
|
Re-referred to Coms. on P.E. & R. and G.O. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/24/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/24/2022
|
Referred to Coms. on G.O. and P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2022
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2022
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|