California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB26 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 7, 2020

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2021

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2021

Amended

Bill July 7, 2021
Bill May 27, 2021
Bill May 24, 2021
Bill March 25, 2021