Assembly | 05/19/2022 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 05/11/2022 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/19/2022 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/12/2022 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 04/06/2022 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | ||
Assembly | 03/28/2022 | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. | ||
Assembly | 03/24/2022 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/24/2022 | Referred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and NAT. RES. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2022 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. | ||
Assembly | 02/18/2022 | Introduced. To print. |