Assembly | 04/26/2022 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 04/19/2022 | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. | ||
Assembly | 04/18/2022 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/06/2022 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 03/10/2022 | Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2022 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. | ||
Assembly | 02/18/2022 | Introduced. To print. |