Assembly | 08/29/2022 | Vetoed by Governor. | ||
08/16/2022 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |||
Assembly | 08/08/2022 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/08/2022 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4685.). | ||
Senate | 08/03/2022 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/15/2022 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/14/2022 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 13). | ||
Senate | 05/04/2022 | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | ||
Senate | 04/19/2022 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 04/18/2022 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 4259.) | ||
Assembly | 04/05/2022 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 5). | ||
Assembly | 03/28/2022 | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. | ||
Assembly | 03/24/2022 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/10/2022 | Referred to Com. on B. & P. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2022 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. | ||
Assembly | 02/18/2022 | Introduced. To print. |