Senate
|
08/11/2022
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2022
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2022
|
Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 0. Page 4942.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2022
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4736.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2022
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2022
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/31/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on INS. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (March 30). Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/29/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2022
|
Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2022
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2022
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|