Assembly | 06/06/2022 | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Levine. | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2022 | Reconsideration granted. | ||
Assembly | 05/02/2022 | Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Levine. | ||
Assembly | 05/02/2022 | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 18. Noes 18. Page 4522.). | ||
Assembly | 04/07/2022 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 04/06/2022 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 4.) (April 6). | ||
Assembly | 03/24/2022 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (March 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/15/2022 | Re-referred to Com. on C. & C. | ||
Assembly | 03/11/2022 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on C. & C. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/10/2022 | Referred to Com. on C. & C. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2022 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. | ||
Assembly | 02/18/2022 | Introduced. To print. |