California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2647 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2022

Enrolled

Bill August 24, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2022

Amended

Bill August 4, 2022
Bill August 1, 2022
Bill April 19, 2022