Assembly | 02/01/2022 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2022 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2021 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 04/14/2021 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 03/24/2021 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (March 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 01/28/2021 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Assembly | 01/16/2021 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 15. | ||
Assembly | 01/15/2021 | Read first time. To print. |