California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2651 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2022

Enrolled

Bill August 25, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2022

Amended

Bill May 19, 2022
Bill April 25, 2022