Senate
|
08/30/2022
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Eggman.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2022
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2022
|
From Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2022
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2022
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5036.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2022
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/24/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/24/2022
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2022
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2022
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|