|
06/21/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 35, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2022
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4130.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 31).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2022
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 0. Page 4402.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/30/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/29/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/14/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/10/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2022
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2022
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|