|
09/18/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 414, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/18/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2022
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2022
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2022
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2022
|
Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2022
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 4988.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2022
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2022
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2022
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2022
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5022.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/10/2022
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2022
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2022
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|