Assembly | 05/26/2022 | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Wood. | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2022 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/19/2022 | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/19/2022 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 2.) (May 19). | ||
Assembly | 05/11/2022 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/28/2022 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/27/2022 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/26/2022 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (April 26). | ||
Assembly | 03/10/2022 | Referred to Com. on B. & P. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2022 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. | ||
Assembly | 02/18/2022 | Introduced. To print. |