Senate
|
08/11/2022
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2022
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2022
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 2.) (June 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 10. Noes 2.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2022
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2022
|
Referred to Coms. on E., U. & C., TRANS. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4948.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2022
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2022
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/10/2022
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2022
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2022
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|