California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2721 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2022

Enrolled

Bill August 25, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 23, 2022

Amended

Bill August 1, 2022
Bill March 10, 2022