California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2730 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2022

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2022

Amended

Bill June 30, 2022
Bill May 19, 2022
Bill May 4, 2022
Bill April 20, 2022
Bill March 24, 2022