|
08/22/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 163, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2022
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2022
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4677.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2022
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2022
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 4740.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2022
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2022
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2022
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2022
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2022
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|