|
09/29/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 803, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2022
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2022
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 20 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4905.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/03/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2022
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2022
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2022
|
From Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (June 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2022
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5027.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2022
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4737.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2022
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 4).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2022
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2022
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2022
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|