09/28/2022 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 698, Statutes of 2022. | |||
09/28/2022 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
09/06/2022 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |||
Assembly | 08/25/2022 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 57. Noes 15.). | ||
Assembly | 08/25/2022 | Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. | ||
Assembly | 08/24/2022 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | ||
Senate | 08/24/2022 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 5047.). | ||
Senate | 06/21/2022 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/20/2022 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (June 14). | ||
Senate | 06/01/2022 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 05/24/2022 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2022 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 19. Page 4816.) | ||
Assembly | 04/20/2022 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 04/19/2022 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (April 19). | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2022 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. | ||
Assembly | 02/18/2022 | Introduced. To print. |