Assembly | 05/19/2022 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 05/19/2022 | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4736.) | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2022 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 05/05/2022 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/26/2022 | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | ||
Assembly | 04/25/2022 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/18/2022 | In committee: Hearing for testimony only. | ||
Assembly | 03/24/2022 | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2022 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. | ||
Assembly | 02/18/2022 | Introduced. To print. |