California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2778 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2022

Enrolled

Bill September 1, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2022

Amended

Bill June 21, 2022
Bill June 6, 2022
Bill April 21, 2022
Bill March 31, 2022