Assembly | 05/26/2022 | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Quirk. | ||
Assembly | 05/19/2022 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4738.) | ||
Assembly | 05/12/2022 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/11/2022 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 11). | ||
Assembly | 04/27/2022 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/18/2022 | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. | ||
Assembly | 04/07/2022 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/06/2022 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (April 4). | ||
Assembly | 03/17/2022 | Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and E.S. & T.M. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2022 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. | ||
Assembly | 02/18/2022 | Introduced. To print. |