Senate
|
08/11/2022
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2022
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2022
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2022
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 42. Noes 23.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2022
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4815.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 4.) (May 4).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2022
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/31/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/30/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2022
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2022
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|